NY A06532 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the "disaster preparedness and emergency planning act"; authorizes a local sales tax exemption for emergency preparedness supplies; requires the division of homeland security and emergency services, in conjunction with the department of taxation and finance, to establish, promote and publish on the web a list of eligible items.
Title
Creates the "disaster preparedness and emergency planning act"; authorizes a local sales tax exemption for emergency preparedness supplies; requires the division of homeland security and emergency services, in conjunction with the department of taxation and finance, to establish, promote and publish on the web a list of eligible items.
Sponsors
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] | Asm. Dov Hikind [D] | Asm. Karim Camara [D] |
Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Joseph Saladino [R] |
Asm. Frank Skartados [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | print number 6532b |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | print number 6532a |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04773 (Same As) 2014-04-23 - PRINT NUMBER 4773C