NY A06525 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - substituted by s4493
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - substituted by s4493
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authorization of the county of Rensselaer to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Relates to extending the authorization of the county of Rensselaer to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Assembly | substituted by s4493 |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.497 |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04493 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.175