NY A06500 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-3)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to making all single occupancy bathrooms gender neutral in school districts, charter schools, SUNY, CUNY, community colleges, restaurants, bars, mercantile establishments, factories and state owned or operated buildings.
Title
Relates to making all single occupancy bathrooms gender neutral in school districts, charter schools, SUNY, CUNY, community colleges, restaurants, bars, mercantile establishments, factories and state owned or operated buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-06-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 6500a |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05993 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES