NY A06474 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - signed chap.349
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - signed chap.349
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to exempting the real property of a land bank from certain sewer rent and user charges imposed by the state of New York and by any of its political subdivisions.
Title
Relates to exempting the real property of a land bank from certain sewer rent and user charges imposed by the state of New York and by any of its political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.349 |
2017-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.302 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4346A |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.387 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.387 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | print number 6474a |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04346 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6474A