NY A06459 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-03 - print number 6459a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-03 - print number 6459a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits assessment of certain fees and costs upon wrongful denial of access to records under the freedom of information law when either the person has substantially prevailed, or if the agency failed to respond within the statutory time.
Title
Permits assessment of certain fees and costs upon wrongful denial of access to records under the freedom of information law when either the person has substantially prevailed, or if the agency failed to respond within the statutory time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | Assembly | print number 6459a |
2022-10-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02004 (Same As) 2022-09-23 - PRINT NUMBER 2004A