NY A06453 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-11 - substituted by s2598a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-11 - substituted by s2598a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Islip to accept an application for exemption from real property taxes from the Gospel Tabernacle Church of God in Christ for a certain parcel of land located in the town of Islip.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Islip to accept an application for exemption from real property taxes from the Gospel Tabernacle Church of God in Christ for a certain parcel of land located in the town of Islip.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-11 | Assembly | substituted by s2598a |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.127 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.127 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S02598 (Same As) 2013-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.390