NY A06445 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires motor vehicles manufactured or assembled after July 1, 2021 that are sold or registered in this state to have an option to be equipped with a carbon monoxide (CO) detector.
Title
Requires motor vehicles manufactured or assembled after July 1, 2021 that are sold or registered in this state to have an option to be equipped with a carbon monoxide (CO) detector.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | print number 6445a |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |