NY A06431 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-19 - print number 6431a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-19 - print number 6431a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits, in cities having a population of one million or more, the annual increase in real property taxes.
Title
Limits, in cities having a population of one million or more, the annual increase in real property taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Assembly | print number 6431a |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-03-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04547 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES