NY A06406 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the mandatory revocation or suspension of the firearms license of, and eligibility therefor of an individual against whom an order or temporary order of protection has been issued, under certain circumstances.
Title
Provides for the mandatory revocation or suspension of the firearms license of, and eligibility therefor of an individual against whom an order or temporary order of protection has been issued, under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2012-03-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-03-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-02-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.357 |
2012-02-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.397 |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2011-05-02 | Assembly | print number 6406a |
2011-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2011-03-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07205 (Same As) 2012-05-02 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES