NY A06397 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s5402
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s5402
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Chabad of Islip Township, Inc. to file an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption for the 2019-2020 assessment roll.
Title
Authorizes Chabad of Islip Township, Inc. to file an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption for the 2019-2020 assessment roll.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s5402 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.583 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05402 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.355