NY A06373 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - print number 6373a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - print number 6373a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of education to study and report on the provision of services to public school students in grades 8 through 12 by guidance counselors.
Title
Directs the commissioner of education to study and report on the provision of services to public school students in grades 8 through 12 by guidance counselors.
Sponsors
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Philip Ramos [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] |
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | Assembly | print number 6373a |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S02105 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - referred to education