NY S02105 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the commissioner of education to study and report on the provision of services to public school students in grades 8 through 12 by guidance counselors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commissioner of education to study and report on the provision of services to public school students in grades 8 through 12 by guidance counselors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13Assemblyreferred to education
2018-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-02Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-01Senate1ST REPORT CAL.960
2018-01-31SenatePRINT NUMBER 2105A
2018-01-31SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-19Assemblyreferred to education
2017-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1859
2017-06-06SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-01-12SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A06373 (Same As) 2018-02-09 - print number 6373a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback