NY A06349 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-14)
Status: Vetoed on September 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this legislation is to criminalize endangering the welfare of an incompetent or physically disabled person.
Title
An act to amend the penal law, in relation to endangering the welfare of an incompetent or physically disabled person
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-17 | tabled | |
2009-09-16 | vetoed memo.69 | |
2009-09-04 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.920 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5208 | |
2009-06-11 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-10 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-10 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-10 | ordered to third reading rules cal.138 | |
2009-06-10 | rules report cal.138 | |
2009-06-10 | reported | |
2009-06-08 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-03-02 | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S5208 (Same As) 2009-07-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6349