NY A06298 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of dogs, cats and rabbits by retail pet shops; authorizes collaboration with entities to provide space to showcase cats or dogs owned by certain entities for the purpose of adoption.
Title
Prohibits the sale of dogs, cats and rabbits by retail pet shops; authorizes collaboration with entities to provide space to showcase cats or dogs owned by certain entities for the purpose of adoption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | print number 6298a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S04234 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - referred to agriculture