NY A06294 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - ordered to third reading rules cal.452
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes permitted variations from generally accepted accounting principles for the purposes of determining a deficit with respect to the budget and accounts of the city of New York.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes permitted variations from generally accepted accounting principles for the purposes of determining a deficit with respect to the budget and accounts of the city of New York.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.452
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.452
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-03-21Assemblyprint number 6294a
2019-03-21Assemblyamend and recommit to cities
2019-03-04Assemblyreferred to cities

Same As/Similar To

S04196 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - referred to cities

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06294&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06294&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06294
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06294&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06294A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06294&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06294&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06294&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback