NY A06287 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9764
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9764
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the highway system in Kings county as the "Fort Hamilton Veterans Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the highway system in Kings county as the "Fort Hamilton Veterans Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s9764 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.601 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-04-30 | Assembly | print number 6287d |
2024-04-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | print number 6287c |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | print number 6287b |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | print number 6287a |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S09764 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - returned to senate