NY A06283 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an electronic registration process integrated within designated agency applications; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an electronic registration process integrated within designated agency applications; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.447
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-05-15SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2017-05-15Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-15Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-04Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.295
2017-05-02Assemblyreported
2017-03-08Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-03-01Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S05114 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback