NY A06260 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.233
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.233
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of chemical flame retardants on residential upholstered furniture beginning July first, 2020.
Title
Prohibits the use of chemical flame retardants on residential upholstered furniture beginning July first, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.233 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6260a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.147 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.147 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S01367 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
S06512 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
S06512 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION