NY A06246 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.440
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.440
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notaries public and commissioners of deeds to complete and retain certain documents relating to the transfer of residential real property.
Title
Requires notaries public and commissioners of deeds to complete and retain certain documents relating to the transfer of residential real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.440 |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.534 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | print number 6246a |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05756 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE