NY A06246 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - committed to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - committed to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to commission hearings of racetrack ejectments and denials of access of commission licensees.
Title
Relates to commission hearings of racetrack ejectments and denials of access of commission licensees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | Assembly | committed to racing and wagering |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.240 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.248 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.248 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S05836 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING