NY A06244 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-6)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to protection against unwarranted surveillance.
Title
Relates to protection against unwarranted surveillance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.162 |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2013-03-25 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06412 (Same As) 2014-01-22 - REFERRED TO CODES