NY A06239 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - held for consideration in labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - held for consideration in labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the minimum wage on and after 2021 to $13.20 and subsequently prevents consideration of an increase in the minimum wage until December 31, 2024 outside of the city of New York and outside the counties of Nassau, Suffolk, and Westchester.
Title
Increases the minimum wage on and after 2021 to $13.20 and subsequently prevents consideration of an increase in the minimum wage until December 31, 2024 outside of the city of New York and outside the counties of Nassau, Suffolk, and Westchester.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Assembly | held for consideration in labor |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | print number 6239a |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S05417 (Same As) 2022-01-13 - PRINT NUMBER 5417B