NY A06229 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - substituted by s3984
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - substituted by s3984
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an electronic version of a town clerk's sign-board on a town website and a link to the sign-board to appear on the town website's homepage if the town maintains a regularly and routinely updated website and utilizes a high speed internet connection.
Title
Requires an electronic version of a town clerk's sign-board on a town website and a link to the sign-board to appear on the town website's homepage if the town maintains a regularly and routinely updated website and utilizes a high speed internet connection.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Assembly | substituted by s3984 |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.262 |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S03984 (Same As) 2021-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.508