NY S03984 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.508
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.508
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an electronic version of a town clerk's sign-board on a town website and a link to the sign-board to appear on the town website's homepage if the town maintains a regularly and routinely updated website and utilizes a high speed internet connection.
Title
Requires an electronic version of a town clerk's sign-board on a town website and a link to the sign-board to appear on the town website's homepage if the town maintains a regularly and routinely updated website and utilizes a high speed internet connection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.508 |
2021-10-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.262 |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | substituted for a6229 |
2021-03-05 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.446 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06229 (Same As) 2021-05-05 - substituted by s3984