NY A06226 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - substituted by s4392
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - substituted by s4392
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from November 30, 2015 to November 30, 2017, the authorization granted to the county of Madison to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends from November 30, 2015 to November 30, 2017, the authorization granted to the county of Madison to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s4392 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.247 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.247 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04392 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.172