NY A06214 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - committed to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - committed to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires annual reports to contain information specific to veteran-owned small businesses.
Title
Requires annual reports to contain information specific to veteran-owned small businesses.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ramos [D] | Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] |
Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Assembly | committed to veterans' affairs |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.288 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.161 |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | reported |
2013-03-15 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S00359 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS