NY A06156 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits smoking in public parks and pedestrian plazas; sets $50 fine; defines terms.
Title
Prohibits smoking in public parks and pedestrian plazas; sets $50 fine; defines terms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-05-04 | Assembly | print number 6156a |
2011-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2011-03-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06564 (Same As) 2012-02-28 - REFERRED TO HEALTH