NY A06136 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands retraining opportunities to unemployed citizens of the state.
Title
Expands retraining opportunities to unemployed citizens of the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2011-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-03-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S00722 (Same As) 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES