NY A06110 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Vetoed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides small businesses with grants of up to $100,000 to commercialize energy and environmental technology innovations and ideas in-state to stimulate economic development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides small businesses with grants of up to $100,000 to commercialize energy and environmental technology innovations and ideas in-state to stimulate economic development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29Senatetabled
2017-11-29Senatevetoed memo.178
2017-11-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1995
2017-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1120
2017-05-17SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2017-05-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-17Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-11Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.348
2017-05-09Assemblyreported
2017-05-02Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-02-23Assemblyreferred to small business

Same As/Similar To

S01120 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6110

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06110&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06110&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06110
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06110&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06110&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06110&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A6110#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback