NY A06091 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - signed chap.191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - signed chap.191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the appointment and promotion of supervisors of the emergency medical service.
Title
Relates to the appointment and promotion of supervisors of the emergency medical service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Senate | signed chap.191 |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.44 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2042 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.162 |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S02042 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - signed chap.191