NY S02042 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - signed chap.191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - signed chap.191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the appointment and promotion of supervisors of the emergency medical service.
Title
Relates to the appointment and promotion of supervisors of the emergency medical service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Senate | signed chap.191 |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.44 |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2042 |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-03-28 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-21 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.162 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | referred to governmental employees |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6091 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-29 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-01-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.44 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A06091 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - signed chap.191