NY A06087 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - substituted by s6079
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - substituted by s6079
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of the provisions authorizing the county of Cattaraugus to impose an additional one percent sales and compensating use taxes until November 30, 2025.
Title
Extends the expiration of the provisions authorizing the county of Cattaraugus to impose an additional one percent sales and compensating use taxes until November 30, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s6079 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.637 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06079 (Same As) 2023-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.249