NY A06070 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-08 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-08 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the manufacture, distribution and sale of children's foam mats containing formamide.
Title
Prohibits the manufacture, distribution and sale of children's foam mats containing formamide.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2011-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-05-18 | Assembly | print number 6070a |
2011-05-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2011-03-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |