NY A06040 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - signed chap.239
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - signed chap.239
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes electronic messaging texts as a form of telemarketing communication for purposes of the no-call registry.
Title
Includes electronic messaging texts as a form of telemarketing communication for purposes of the no-call registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | Assembly | signed chap.239 |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1442 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3941 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.187 |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S03941 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6040