NY A06038 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - print number 6038a
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - print number 6038a
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to voting rights expansion, voter registration on election day, expansion of the use of and requirements for absentee voting, creation of a real-time statewide voter registration database, special ballots for election employees, and voter affidavits.
Title
Relates to voting rights expansion, voter registration on election day, expansion of the use of and requirements for absentee voting, creation of a real-time statewide voter registration database, special ballots for election employees, and voter affidavits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | Assembly | print number 6038a |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01770 (Same As) 2016-01-28 - PRINT NUMBER 1770A