NY A06029 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that services provided by school-based health centers shall not be provided to medical assistance recipients through managed care programs.
Title
Provides that services provided by school-based health centers shall not be provided to medical assistance recipients through managed care programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Assembly | tabled |
2023-11-17 | Assembly | vetoed memo.58 |
2023-11-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1362 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2339 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.373 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.373 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02339 (Same As) 2023-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6029