NY A06019 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals certain provisions regarding the adoption of a new or revised city charter proposed by a charter commission which limit the submission of questions to a city's qualified electors: eliminates the rule that provides that whenever a city charter commission puts a proposal on the local ballot, all other local referendum proposals are barred from the ballot.
Title
An act to repeal paragraphs (e), (f) and (g) of subdivision 5 of section 36 of the municipal home rule law, relating to limitations on the submitting of a question to the qualified electors of a city when there is a question submitted by a charter commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | REFERRED TO CITIES | |
2010-03-10 | delivered to senate | |
2010-03-10 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.419 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-05-04 | REFERRED TO CITIES | |
2009-05-04 | delivered to senate | |
2009-05-04 | passed assembly | |
2009-04-30 | advanced to third reading cal.472 | |
2009-04-28 | reported | |
2009-02-24 | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S7110 (Same As) 2010-03-12 - REFERRED TO CITIES