NY A06012 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes no itinerant vendor, except for a manufacturer, an authorized manufacturer's representative, or authorized distributor, shall offer for sale baby food, nonprescription drugs, cosmetics or batteries.
Title
Establishes no itinerant vendor, except for a manufacturer, an authorized manufacturer's representative, or authorized distributor, shall offer for sale baby food, nonprescription drugs, cosmetics or batteries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-03-10 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S03840 (Same As) 2016-03-22 - referred to economic development