NY A06011 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants a real property tax exemption, at the option of the local taxing authority, to nonprofit organizations that purchase real property after the particular municipality's levy of taxes or taxable status date if the organization files an application for exemption with the assessor.
Title
Grants a real property tax exemption, at the option of the local taxing authority, to nonprofit organizations that purchase real property after the particular municipality's levy of taxes or taxable status date if the organization files an application for exemption with the assessor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-03-10 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S00605 (Same As) 2016-05-04 - referred to ways and means