NY A05999 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - print number 5999a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - print number 5999a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for exemptions from sales tax for energy-star qualified appliances and grants municipalities the option to provide such exemption.
Title
Provides for exemptions from sales tax for energy-star qualified appliances and grants municipalities the option to provide such exemption.
Sponsors
Asm. Erik Dilan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Assembly | print number 5999a |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02153 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - PRINT NUMBER 2153A