NY A05972 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing certain health care professionals licensed to practice in other jurisdictions to practice in this state in connection with an event sanctioned by New York Road Runners; extends the provisions thereof.
Title
Relates to authorizing certain health care professionals licensed to practice in other jurisdictions to practice in this state in connection with an event sanctioned by New York Road Runners; extends the provisions thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.73 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-14 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-14 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.121 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | substituted for a5972 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.253 |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | substituted by s4023 |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.121 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04023 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.73