NY A05972 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-18 - print number 5972a
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "voter empowerment act of New York" to streamline the process for registering to vote.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "voter empowerment act of New York" to streamline the process for registering to vote.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-18Assemblyprint number 5972a
2016-05-18Assemblyamend and recommit to election law
2016-01-06Assemblyreferred to election law
2015-03-09Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S02538 (Same As) 2016-05-19 - PRINT NUMBER 2538C

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback