NY S02538 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-19 - PRINT NUMBER 2538C
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "voter empowerment act of New York" to streamline the process for registering to vote.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "voter empowerment act of New York" to streamline the process for registering to vote.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-19SenatePRINT NUMBER 2538C
2016-05-19SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2016-01-26SenatePRINT NUMBER 2538B
2016-01-26SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2016-01-06SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2015-03-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 2538A
2015-03-10SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2015-01-26SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A05972 (Same As) 2016-05-18 - print number 5972a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback