NY A05963 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to procedures performed by cardiovascular technologists.
Title
Relates to procedures performed by cardiovascular technologists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | print number 5963b |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | print number 5963a |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S03570 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN