NY A05934 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-30 - print number 5934c
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-30 - print number 5934c
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "voting integrity and verification act of New York (VIVA NY)"; provides that each voter is entitled to the use of an individual, voter verifiable paper ballot of the voter's vote and the opportunity to mark it.
Title
Enacts the "voting integrity and verification act of New York (VIVA NY)"; provides that each voter is entitled to the use of an individual, voter verifiable paper ballot of the voter's vote and the opportunity to mark it.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Assembly | print number 5934c |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2023-10-11 | Assembly | print number 5934b |
2023-10-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2023-03-31 | Assembly | print number 5934a |
2023-03-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2023-03-24 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S06169 (Same As) 2024-05-28 - PRINT NUMBER 6169C