NY A05928 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - print number 5928a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - print number 5928a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permanent total disability benefits received by disabled volunteer firefighters; provides for a cost-of-living adjustment to such benefits.
Title
Relates to permanent total disability benefits received by disabled volunteer firefighters; provides for a cost-of-living adjustment to such benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Assembly | print number 5928a |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2013-03-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S03938 (Same As) 2014-03-26 - PRINT NUMBER 3938A