NY A05906 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the food donation and food scraps recycling program by scaling down the annual average tonnage requirement every two years until 2028; removes exceptions regarding recycler capacity.
Title
Expands the food donation and food scraps recycling program by scaling down the annual average tonnage requirement every two years until 2028; removes exceptions regarding recycler capacity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-02-28 | Assembly | print number 5906a |
2024-02-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2023-03-24 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05331 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5331A