NY A05884 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes the removal of pension and retirement benefits from persons convicted of certain felonies.
Title
Proposes the removal of pension and retirement benefits from persons convicted of certain felonies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S01923 (Same As) 2016-04-06 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY