NY A05859 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - signed chap.118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - signed chap.118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to the use of electronic means for the commencement and filing of papers in certain actions or proceedings until September 1, 2022.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to the use of electronic means for the commencement and filing of papers in certain actions or proceedings until September 1, 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Assembly | signed chap.118 |
2021-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1086 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6622 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.127 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.127 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06622 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5859