NY A05845 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.192
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.192
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that in grand jury proceedings when following submission to a grand jury of a criminal charge or charges, the grand jury dismisses all charges presented or directs the district attorney to dismiss all charges or directs the DA to file in a local criminal court an application for disclosure of certain materials; authorizes the court to limit disclosure of certain items where there is a reasonable likelihood that such disclosure may lead to the identity of a witness who is not a public servant or expert witness; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides that in grand jury proceedings when following submission to a grand jury of a criminal charge or charges, the grand jury dismisses all charges presented or directs the district attorney to dismiss all charges or directs the DA to file in a local criminal court an application for disclosure of certain materials; authorizes the court to limit disclosure of certain items where there is a reasonable likelihood that such disclosure may lead to the identity of a witness who is not a public servant or expert witness; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.192 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.153 |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-26 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03314 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CODES